CA SB300 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to elections, and calling an election, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: ballot measures.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB300 Umberg Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - SB 300 Umberg Senate Third Reading By BERMAN (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB300 Umberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - SB 300 Umberg Senate Third Reading By BERMAN (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB300 Umberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3895.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 4972.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4952.) |
2020-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1029.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 771.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 85320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |