CA SB300 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21201 and 21201.5 of, and to add Section 21201.6 to, the Financial Code, relating to pawnbrokers.
Title
Pawnbrokers: regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB300 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 300 Mendoza Senate Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB300 Mendoza (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 300 Mendoza Senate Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB300 Mendoza (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2663.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2965.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Waldron. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1065.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 728.) (April 21). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 21201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 21201.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 21201.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 21208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |