CA SB30 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 614, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 614, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12922.5 to the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: climate change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB30 Lara et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 30 Lara Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB30 Lara (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 30 Lara Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB30 Lara (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 614, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5686.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 5674.) |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Set for hearing August 23. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5536.) Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 6407.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on INS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | July 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 1397.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1176.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 826.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8900 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 12922.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 1103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |