CA SB3 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 365, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 16 (commencing with Section 54000) to Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Article 5z (commencing with Section 998.600) to Chapter 6 of Division 4 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to housing, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans and Affordable Housing Bond Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB3 Beall et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 3 Beall Third Reading Urgency By GLORIA (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB3 Beall et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 365, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
2017-09-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2958.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-14AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 3416.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-08-31AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-31AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 2826.)
2017-08-31AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-08-29AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-06-01SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1398.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1175.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-03SenateApril 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 444.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2017-03-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 288.) (February 28). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-02-22SenateSet for hearing February 28.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05Senate(Corrected December 6).
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code54000New CodeSee Bill Text
Military and Veterans Code998.600New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback