CA SB299 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2264, 2265, 2266, 2267, 2270, and 2401 of, and to add Sections 2265.1 and 2278 to, the Elections Code, relating to voting.
Title
Voter registration: California New Motor Voter Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB299 Eggman et al (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1252.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1164.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 473.) (March 22). |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2264 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2265 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2265.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 2266 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2267 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2278 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 2401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |