CA SB295 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 81033 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: community colleges: site
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-03-15 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-09 | Set for hearing March 23. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 81033 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_295&sess=1112&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_295_bill_20110214_introduced.html |