CA SB294 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 515, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 1747.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hospice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospice: services to seriously ill patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB294 Hernandez et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 294 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WALDRON (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 294 Hernandez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB294 Hernandez et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 515, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-05 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2835.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3151.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-07-17AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-07-17AssemblyAction rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
2017-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2017-07-10SenateOrdered to the Assembly.
2017-07-10SenateWithdrawn from engrossing and enrolling.
2017-07-06SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-07-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2474.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1321.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-24SenateApril 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1746Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1747.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1749Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback