CA SB293 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53395.82 to the Government Code, relating to infrastructure financing districts.
Title
Infrastructure financing districts: formation: issuance of bonds: City of Oakland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB293 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SB 293 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB293 Skinner (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SB 293 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB293 Skinner (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 2438.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 11. Page 2908.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 957.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 846.) (April 24). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53395.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |