CA SB293 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19849.18 of the Government Code, relating to state employees.
Title
State employment: supervisors.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19849.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |