CA SB290 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 8 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 4502 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marine mammals and sea turtles: entanglement and stranding: emergency rescue services: grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 290 Jackson Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB290 Jackson et al (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-08SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
2017-07-19AssemblyJuly 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1181.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 828.) (April 25).
2017-03-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-03-08SenateMarch 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code4502New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback