CA SB288 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 100501, 100502, 100503, and 100522 of the Government Code, to amend Section 1366.6 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10112.3 of the Insurance Code, relating to health coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health coverage: small employers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB288 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2018-08-20AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2018-08-16AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Carrillo.
2017-09-13AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2017-08-21AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-21AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
2017-07-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 886.) (April 26).
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback