CA SB285 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.3 (commencing with Section 628) to Title 15 of Part 1 of the Penal Code, relating to massage therapy.
Title
Massage therapy instruction: fraud: criminal
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-07-14 - Assembly - SB 285 Correa Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB285 Correa (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB285 Correa (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-08-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2011-07-14 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-07-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2342.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1188.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-24 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 862.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-26 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 628 | New Code | See Bill Text |