CA SB284 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3212.15 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation: firefighters and peace officers: post-traumatic stress.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB284 Stern et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 284 Stern Senate Third Reading By Cooper (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB284 Stern (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 284 Stern Senate Third Reading By Cooper (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB284 Stern (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5225.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6036.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cooper. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1379.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1186.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 406.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 8. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |