CA SB283 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - June 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - June 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27491.25 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 20011 of the Vehicle Code, relating to fatal vehicular accidents.
Title
Fatal vehicular accidents: chemical test results.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB283 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB283 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Assembly | June 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) Reconsideration granted. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 440.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27491.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 20011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |