CA SB283 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4512 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental services.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] |
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | May 1 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4512.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |