CA SB281 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 65914.5 to the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing development: permits and other entitlements: extension.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB281 Wiener et al (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2020-07-29AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2020-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2020-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2020-01-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-01-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 3151.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3120.) (January 21).
2020-01-14SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2020-01-06Senate(Corrected January 6).
2020-01-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30SenateMay 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 802.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 23 in PUB. S. pending receipt.
2019-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 4. Page 619.) (April 9).
2019-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-28SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 465.) (March 27).
2019-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2019-03-14SenateMarch 20 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F., G.O., and PUB. S.
2019-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65914.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback