CA SB28 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19829.9845, 19829.9846, 22871.3, 22874.3, 22879, 22944.5, and 22958.1 of, and to add Sections 19829.9847 and 19829.9848 to, the Government Code, relating to state public employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State public employment: memoranda of understanding: approval.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - Assembly - SB 28 Pan Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB28 Pan (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Budget and Fiscal Review ] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2017.
2017-03-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-03-14SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2017-03-09SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-03-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 563.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-03-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-03-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 22. Noes 5.) (March 2).
2017-02-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2017-02-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-02-17SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 220.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-02-17SenateMotion by Senator Monning to lay on table amendments by Senator Stone adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 219.)
2017-02-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-02-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4. Page 171.) (February 9).
2017-02-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-02-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.R. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 162.) (February 6). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-02-03SenateSet for hearing February 9 in B. & F.R. pending receipt.
2017-02-01SenateSet for hearing February 6.
2017-01-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2017-01-26SenateRe-referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and B. & F.R.
2017-01-23SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-23SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback