CA SB275 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 301, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 301, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 131021 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 6403.1 to the Labor Code, relating to personal protective equipment.
Title
Health Care and Essential Workers: personal protective equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 275 Pan Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB275 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB275 Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB275 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB275 Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 301, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 5460.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5408.) |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 61(b)(17) suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 5275.) |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | July 9 set for first hearing.Testimony taken. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 920.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 511.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 131021 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 6403.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |