CA SB275 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal and add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 11759) of Part 1 of Division 10.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol and drug treatment: youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB275 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 275 Portantino Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB275 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-26 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6115.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-30SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 6069.)
2018-08-30SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-08-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6760.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-02-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-06-28AssemblyJune 28 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-05AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1223.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-25SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 515.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-21SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
2017-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code54238.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11759New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback