CA SB275 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 128739 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health data.
Title
Health facility data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB275 Hernandez (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 5. Page 775.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1703.) (April 20). |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 544.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 128739 | New Code | See Bill Text |