CA SB275 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8010 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Local flood control: indebtedness and liability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 8010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_275&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0251-0300/sb_275_bill_20130214_introduced.html |