CA SB275 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 52334.7 to the Education Code, relating to career technical education.
Title
Career technical education: funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB275 Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB275 Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |
2012-06-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-07-06 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1275.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1114.) (May 26). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-25 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 850.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-04-21 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51226 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52334.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 52499.68 | New Code | See Bill Text |