CA SB273 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 546, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 546, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13519 of, and to add Section 803.7 to, the Penal Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB273 Rubio et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 273 Rubio Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB273 Rubio et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 273 Rubio Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB273 Rubio et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 546, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2848.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3334.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1094.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 802.) (April 23). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | March 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13519 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 803.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |