CA SB273 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 660, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 660, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 297.1, 302, 303, 304, 423, 1501, 2210, and 7002 of, and to add Section 298.8 to, the Family Code, and to add Sections 102233 and 102356 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to marriage and domestic partnership.
Title
Marriage and domestic partnership: minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB273 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 273 Hill Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB273 Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 273 Hill Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB273 Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 660, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5924.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6701.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Gonzalez Fletcher. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1339.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 2 p.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1180.) (May 25). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1020.) (May 9). |
2017-05-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | May 2 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | March 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 1501 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 2210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 297.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 298.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 303 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 304 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 304.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 423 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 7002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68085.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102356 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 309.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 315.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 315.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 315.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 315.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |