CA SB271 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 21300) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 14132.85 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to powered wheelchairs.
Title
Powered wheelchairs: repair.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB271 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 271 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Connolly (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB271 Dodd et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 271 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Connolly (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB271 Dodd et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2023-10-07 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2802.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3396.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1345.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1163.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 892.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 746.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21300 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |