CA SB271 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 25658.3 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: minors: license suspension and revocation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2. Page 827.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25658.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25658.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |