CA SB271 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 626.12 to the Penal Code, relating to unmanned aircraft systems.
Title
Unmanned aircraft systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB271 Gaines Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 271 Gaines Senate Third Reading By GATTO (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB271 Gaines (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 271 Gaines Senate Third Reading By GATTO (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB271 Gaines (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2015-10-03 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2015-10-03 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2496.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2845.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | June 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and ED. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 929.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 594.) (April 14). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 626.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |