CA SB270 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 330, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3558 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employment: labor relations: employee information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB270 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Assembly - SB 270 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Cooper (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 270 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Cooper (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB270 Durazo (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 330, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2021-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2609.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 11.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-03AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-03AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2021-09-02AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-02 Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2021-09-02SenateOrdered to the Assembly.
2021-09-02SenateWithdrawn from engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-01SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 2601.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
2021-08-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 1310.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1186.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 775.) (April 13).
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 13.
2021-04-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 670.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
2021-01-29SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code3558Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback