CA SB270 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1232 to the Government Code, relating to state employees, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State employees: compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-26 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 416.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-15 | Set for hearing March 21. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 1232 | New Code | See Bill Text |