CA SB27 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression
Action: 2011-08-25 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22112.5, 22119.2, 22461, 22905, 25009, 26302, and 26505 of, to amend and repeal Section 24214.5 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 26806 of, and to add Sections 24214.6 and 26307 to, the Education Code, and to amend Sections 20221, 20630, 20636, 20636.1, and 21220 of, and to add Section 21220.3 to, the Government Code, relating to public retirement systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees' retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB27 Simitian (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-25 Hearing postponed by committee.
2011-08-17 Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-08-15 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-07-07 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-07-06 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 6).
2011-06-28 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
2011-06-20 Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
2011-06-02 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-06-01 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1222.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-05-27 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-26 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1111.) (May 26).
2011-05-20 Set for hearing May 26.
2011-04-11 Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2011-04-01 Set for hearing April 11.
2011-03-22 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 416.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-03-15 Set for hearing March 21.
2011-03-03 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2011-01-20 Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2010-12-07 From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
2010-12-06 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_27&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20101206_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20110303_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20110628_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20110707_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_bill_20110815_amended_asm_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20110321_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20110411_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20110526_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20110601_1146AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_27_vote_20110706_000002_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback