CA SB269 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 601, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 601, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8043.1, 8046, and 8047 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to commercial fishing.
Title
Commercial fishing businesses and marine aquaria: landing receipts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB269 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 269 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB269 McGuire (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 269 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB269 McGuire (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 601, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5685.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 5619.) |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Set for hearing August 22. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6309.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1347.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 364.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 8043.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8046 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8047 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 35617 | Amended Code | Citation Text |