CA SB268 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-05 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-05 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 130051 of, and to add Section 130051.2 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB268 Mendoza (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 1309.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 25). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 1021.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 130051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |