CA SB267 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 588, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 588, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 10912 of the Water Code, relating to water, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Water supply planning: renewable energy plants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB267 Rubio Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 267 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB267 Rubio Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 267 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB267 Rubio Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 588, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2154.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-25 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-25 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2598.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2011-06-30 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-06-20 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1993.) | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and L. GOV. | |
2011-05-19 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1032.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-04-15 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-13 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 12). | |
2011-03-29 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-03-24 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-03-17 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10912 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13376 | Amended Code | Citation Text |