CA SB265 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 3060.3 and 5072 to the Penal Code, relating to parole, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Parole: violators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-28 - Senate - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-04-28 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 704.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2009-04-01 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-03-31 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-24 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-25 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |