CA SB262 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 71350, 71354, 71356, 71358, and 71360 of the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.
Title
Climate change: climate adaptation: advisory council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB262 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB262 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 11). |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 768.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 537.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71354 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71356 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71358 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |