CA SB262 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 30315 of, and to add Section 30315.2 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.
Title
Coastal resources: California Coastal Commission:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB262 Lowenthal (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Assembly - SB 262 Lowenthal Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB262 Lowenthal (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Assembly - SB 262 Lowenthal Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB262 Lowenthal (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Stricken from Senate file. | |
2009-10-11 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-11 | Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m. | |
2009-09-04 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2214.) To enrollment. | |
2009-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-08-24 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 2712.) To Senate. | |
2009-07-14 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-13 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 6.) | |
2009-06-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-06-08 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-05-26 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 18. Page 1010.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 850.) | |
2009-05-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-04-29 | Set for hearing May 12. | |
2009-04-02 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-01 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-02-25 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |