CA SB260 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11383.8 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled: substances ephedrine or pseudoephedrine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-26 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. | |
2011-04-05 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-23 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-03-22 | Set for hearing April 4. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. | |
2011-02-11 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11383.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |