CA SB26 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 17052.6 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: working families child care tax credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-22SenateApril 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 550.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17052.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback