CA SB255 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Referred to Coms. on INS. and AGING & L.T.C.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Referred to Coms. on INS. and AGING & L.T.C.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10232.1 and 10232.81 of the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 22009 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to long-term care, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Partnership for Long-Term Care Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB255 Mendoza Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on INS. and AGING & L.T.C. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1148.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1100.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and HEALTH. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10232.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10232.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 22009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |