CA SB254 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - June 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - June 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 25513 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to delivery network companies.
Title
Delivery network companies: deliveries of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB254 Portantino (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | July 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 1390.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1180.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 826.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | April 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and G.O. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25513 | New Code | See Bill Text |