CA SB25 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-06 - August 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-06 - August 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21168.6.9 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: projects funded by qualified opportunity zone funds or other public funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB25 Caballero et al (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB25 Caballero et al (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-06 | Assembly | August 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | July 8 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. & E. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 1257.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 797.) (April 23). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 651.) (April 10). |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | March 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21168.6.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |