CA SB25 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 927, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 927, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 13109.7, 13109.8, and 13109.9 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: alternate ballot order: Los Angeles County pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB25 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 25 Portantino Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB25 Portantino et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 25 Portantino Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB25 Portantino et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 927, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 6138.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 6068.) |
2018-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 6759.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | June 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-08-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1072.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 847.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 11100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 68075.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 13109.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 13109.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 13109.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |