CA SB249 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 459, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 5090.10, 5090.11, 5090.24, 5090.30, 5090.31, 5090.32, 5090.34, 5090.35, 5090.43, 5090.50, and 5090.61 of, to amend and repeal Section 5090.15 of, to add Sections 5090.13, 5090.14, 5090.14.1, and 5090.39 to, and to repeal Section 5090.70 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Off-highway motor vehicle recreation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB249 Allen Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 249 Allen Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB249 Allen (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-03 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 459, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-03 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2926.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3263.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (July 11).
2017-06-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-06-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 1397.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-01SenateMay 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 750.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 364.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-02-18SenateSet for hearing March 14.
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and T. & H.
2017-02-08SenateRead first time.
2017-02-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
2017-02-07SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code5090.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5090.14New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5090.14.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5090.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.24Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.30Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.31Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.32Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.34Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.35Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.39New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5090.43Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.50Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.60Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.61Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.70Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code8352.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code38225Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback