CA SB248 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3108, 3213, 3227, and 3780 of, to add Sections 3011, 3106.3, 3113, 3114, 3165, 3213.5, 3221, 3227.2, and 3786 to, and to add Article 2.7 (commencing with Section 3140) to Chapter 1 of Division 3 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB248 Pavley (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB248 Pavley (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | August 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 13). |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 18. Page 1334.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1150.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 592.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3011 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3106.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3165 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3213.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3221 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3227.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3780 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3786 | New Code | See Bill Text |