CA SB245 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11580.2 of the Insurance Code, relating to automobile insurance.
Title
Automobile insurance: underinsured motorist coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 11580.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_245&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_245_bill_20150218_introduced.html |