CA SB244 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 798.88 of the Civil Code, and to amend and repeal Section 85 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to mobilehomes.
Title
Mobilehomes: injunctions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-09 - Assembly - SB 244 Vidak Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB244 Vidak (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB244 Vidak (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2328.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and H. & C.D. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 635.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 7). |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 85 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 798.88 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |