CA SB243 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to citrus disease prevention, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, usual current expenses of the state.
Title
Citrus disease prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - SB 243 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB243 Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB243 Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1641.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 1640.) |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Art. IV. Sec. 8(b)(1) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 956.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | April 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 428.) . Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |