CA SB242 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 538, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 538, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1374.192 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10120.35 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health care provider reimbursements.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB242 Newman et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 242 Newman Senate Third Reading By Robert Rivas (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB242 Newman et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 242 Newman Senate Third Reading By Robert Rivas (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB242 Newman et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 538, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2554.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 11. Page 2912.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 13). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1329.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1184.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 456.) (March 10). |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1374.192 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10120.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |