CA SB242 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 29.1 (commencing with Section 5900) to Part 3 of Division 7 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to the Property Assessed Clean Energy program.
Title
Property Assessed Clean Energy program: program administrator.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB242 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 242 Skinner Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB242 Skinner (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 242 Skinner Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB242 Skinner (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2692.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3033.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 18). |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and B. & F. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 1258.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Published May 18 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 744.) (April 19). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 5900 | New Code | See Bill Text |