CA SB241 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 513, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 513, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 123105 and 123110 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 5328 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to medical records.
Title
Medical records: access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB241 Monning Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 241 Monning Senate Third Reading By LIMÓN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB241 Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 241 Monning Senate Third Reading By LIMÓN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB241 Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 513, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2994.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3404.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-29 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-29 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1066.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 851.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 558.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 123110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5328 | Amended Code | Citation Text |